Senate | 02/09/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Senator Dernulc added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/31/2023 | Senator Yoder added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Senator Perfect added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/24/2023 | Senator Walker K added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Senator Buchanan added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/17/2023 | Senator Niezgodski added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Senator Bassler |