House | 03/07/2023 | Representative Prescott added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Senator Crane added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | House sponsor: Representative Jeter | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 143: yeas 29, nays 16 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Amendment #1 (Pol) failed; voice vote | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Senator Freeman added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law | ||
Senate | 01/12/2023 | Authored by Senator Baldwin |