1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | SENATE BILL No. 368 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 12-17.2-8. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Early childhood care and education pilot program. |
---|
8 | 8 | | Establishes the early childhood care and education pilot program to |
---|
9 | 9 | | provide a cost sharing approach to fund quality early childhood care |
---|
10 | 10 | | and education. Establishes the early childhood care and education fund, |
---|
11 | 11 | | which is nonreverting. Requires community foundations to report to the |
---|
12 | 12 | | general assembly by September 15, 2026. Provides that the pilot |
---|
13 | 13 | | program expires June 30, 2027. Makes an appropriation. |
---|
14 | 14 | | Effective: July 1, 2023. |
---|
15 | 15 | | Donato |
---|
16 | 16 | | January 17, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Family and Children |
---|
17 | 17 | | Services. |
---|
18 | 18 | | 2023 IN 368—LS 6970/DI 148 Introduced |
---|
19 | 19 | | First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023) |
---|
20 | 20 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
21 | 21 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
22 | 22 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
23 | 23 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
24 | 24 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
25 | 25 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
26 | 26 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
28 | 28 | | between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
29 | 29 | | SENATE BILL No. 368 |
---|
30 | 30 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning |
---|
31 | 31 | | human services and to make an appropriation. |
---|
32 | 32 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
33 | 33 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-17.2-8 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
34 | 34 | | 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
35 | 35 | | 3 JULY 1, 2023]: |
---|
36 | 36 | | 4 Chapter 8. Early Childhood Care And Education Pilot Program |
---|
37 | 37 | | 5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "community foundation" refers |
---|
38 | 38 | | 6 to a nonprofit organization that: |
---|
39 | 39 | | 7 (1) is exempt from federal income taxation under section |
---|
40 | 40 | | 8 501(c)(3) of the Internal Revenue Code; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | 9 (2) supports a broad range of charitable activities within a |
---|
42 | 42 | | 10 participating county. |
---|
43 | 43 | | 11 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "eligible child" means an |
---|
44 | 44 | | 12 individual who: |
---|
45 | 45 | | 13 (1) is less than seven (7) years of age; |
---|
46 | 46 | | 14 (2) is a resident of Indiana; |
---|
47 | 47 | | 15 (3) receives quality early education services from a |
---|
48 | 48 | | 16 participating provider; and |
---|
49 | 49 | | 17 (4) subject to section 8 of this chapter, has a parent or |
---|
50 | 50 | | 2023 IN 368—LS 6970/DI 148 2 |
---|
51 | 51 | | 1 guardian who is employed by a participating employer. |
---|
52 | 52 | | 2 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "participating county" refers to |
---|
53 | 53 | | 3 the following counties: |
---|
54 | 54 | | 4 (1) Adams. |
---|
55 | 55 | | 5 (2) Allen. |
---|
56 | 56 | | 6 (3) DeKalb. |
---|
57 | 57 | | 7 (4) Huntington. |
---|
58 | 58 | | 8 (5) Kosciusko. |
---|
59 | 59 | | 9 (6) LaGrange. |
---|
60 | 60 | | 10 (7) Noble. |
---|
61 | 61 | | 11 (8) Steuben. |
---|
62 | 62 | | 12 (9) Wabash. |
---|
63 | 63 | | 13 (10) Wells. |
---|
64 | 64 | | 14 (11) Whitley. |
---|
65 | 65 | | 15 Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "participating employer" refers |
---|
66 | 66 | | 16 to an employer in a participating county that has chosen to |
---|
67 | 67 | | 17 participate in the pilot program. |
---|
68 | 68 | | 18 Sec. 5. As used in this chapter, "participating provider" refers |
---|
69 | 69 | | 19 to a: |
---|
70 | 70 | | 20 (1) public school, including a charter school; |
---|
71 | 71 | | 21 (2) child care center licensed under IC 12-17.2-4; |
---|
72 | 72 | | 22 (3) child care home licensed under IC 12-17.2-5; or |
---|
73 | 73 | | 23 (4) child care ministry registered under IC 12-17.2-6; |
---|
74 | 74 | | 24 that meets the standards of quality recognized by a Level 3 or |
---|
75 | 75 | | 25 Level 4 paths to QUALITY program rating and has agreed to |
---|
76 | 76 | | 26 participate in the pilot program. |
---|
77 | 77 | | 27 Sec. 6. As used in this chapter, "pilot program" refers to the |
---|
78 | 78 | | 28 early childhood care and education pilot program established by |
---|
79 | 79 | | 29 section 7 of this chapter. |
---|
80 | 80 | | 30 Sec. 7. (a) The early childhood care and education pilot program |
---|
81 | 81 | | 31 is established to provide a cost sharing approach to fund quality |
---|
82 | 82 | | 32 early childhood care and education for an eligible child. |
---|
83 | 83 | | 33 (b) The cost for an eligible child to receive care under the pilot |
---|
84 | 84 | | 34 program from a participating provider shall be paid as follows: |
---|
85 | 85 | | 35 (1) Subject to section 8 of this chapter, the participating |
---|
86 | 86 | | 36 employer shall pay one-third (1/3) of the cost. |
---|
87 | 87 | | 37 (2) The parent or guardian shall pay one-third (1/3) of the |
---|
88 | 88 | | 38 cost. |
---|
89 | 89 | | 39 (3) The state shall pay one-third (1/3) of the cost. |
---|
90 | 90 | | 40 Sec. 8. A participating employer may: |
---|
91 | 91 | | 41 (1) limit the employer's participation to attract new |
---|
92 | 92 | | 42 employees or fill vacancies; and |
---|
93 | 93 | | 2023 IN 368—LS 6970/DI 148 3 |
---|
94 | 94 | | 1 (2) make contributions to a community foundation in amounts |
---|
95 | 95 | | 2 sufficient to pay one-third (1/3) of the cost for an eligible child |
---|
96 | 96 | | 3 to receive care from a participating provider. |
---|
97 | 97 | | 4 Sec. 9. (a) The early childhood care and education fund is |
---|
98 | 98 | | 5 established to pay one-third (1/3) of the cost for each eligible child |
---|
99 | 99 | | 6 who receives care under the pilot program from a participating |
---|
100 | 100 | | 7 provider. |
---|
101 | 101 | | 8 (b) The office of the secretary of family and social services shall |
---|
102 | 102 | | 9 administer the fund. |
---|
103 | 103 | | 10 (c) The fund consists of: |
---|
104 | 104 | | 11 (1) money appropriated to the fund by the general assembly; |
---|
105 | 105 | | 12 and |
---|
106 | 106 | | 13 (2) grants or gifts to the fund. |
---|
107 | 107 | | 14 (d) The fund does not revert to the state general fund. |
---|
108 | 108 | | 15 (e) The expenses of administering the fund shall be paid from |
---|
109 | 109 | | 16 money in the fund. |
---|
110 | 110 | | 17 (f) Eleven million five hundred thousand dollars ($11,500,000) |
---|
111 | 111 | | 18 is appropriated each year from the state general fund to the office |
---|
112 | 112 | | 19 of the secretary of family and social services to carry out this |
---|
113 | 113 | | 20 chapter. |
---|
114 | 114 | | 21 (g) The office of the secretary of family and social services shall |
---|
115 | 115 | | 22 distribute money from the fund to a participating provider in |
---|
116 | 116 | | 23 which a parent or guardian chooses to enroll an eligible child. |
---|
117 | 117 | | 24 Sec. 10. A community foundation shall: |
---|
118 | 118 | | 25 (1) distribute participating employer contributions that the |
---|
119 | 119 | | 26 community foundation receives to the participating provider |
---|
120 | 120 | | 27 in which a parent chooses to enroll an eligible child; and |
---|
121 | 121 | | 28 (2) before September 15, 2026, report to the general assembly, |
---|
122 | 122 | | 29 in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6, regarding |
---|
123 | 123 | | 30 participation costs and the effectiveness of the pilot program. |
---|
124 | 124 | | 31 Sec. 11. This chapter expires June 30, 2027. |
---|
125 | 125 | | 2023 IN 368—LS 6970/DI 148 |
---|