Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 187
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 530: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 555: yeas 90, nays 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: DeVon, Jordan, Genda and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Pressel and Jackson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Hunley and Donato
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 410: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment #4 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Pressel) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives DeVon, King J, Jackson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Pressel
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senators Crane and Hunley added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senators Johnson and Qaddoura added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senator Walker G added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Authored by Senators Rogers and Donato
|
|
|