House | 03/06/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senator Yoder added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Cosponsor: Representative Bauer M | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | House sponsor: Representative DeVon | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 198: yeas 39, nays 9 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senator Qaddoura added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Senator Hunley added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Authored by Senators Donato and Breaux |