Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Public Law 50
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 327: yeas 32, nays 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 315: yeas 86, nays 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Representative Lindauer removed as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Judy) prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 64, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Lindauer, Bartels, Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Soliday
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 36, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Messmer
|
|
|