Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 191
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 546: yeas 92, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 517: yeas 39, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Breaux and Leising
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Glick and Qaddoura
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Abbott, Pressel, Hostettler and Boy
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Lindauer and Harris
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 316: yeas 89, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Representative Harris added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Leising added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Lindauer
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 172: yeas 45, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Perfect) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Glick) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Glick
|
|
|