Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 112
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 357: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 358: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Breaux added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Gore M, Moseley, Boy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Pol
|
|
|