Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 194
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 505: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 533: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Cherry, Snow, Smaltz, Greene and Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Thompson and Porter
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M and Baldwin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Melton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 435: yeas 96, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Representative Hamilton added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2023
|
Representative Porter added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Cosponsor: Representative Cherry
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Thompson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 174: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Senator Baldwin added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Holdman
|
|
|