Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 195
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 527: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 551: yeas 87, nays 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M, Charbonneau, Niemeyer and Dernulc
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Mishler and Melton
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Thompson, Soliday, Olthoff, Harris, Jackson and Smith V
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Slager and Hatcher
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 412: yeas 89, nays 6
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Slager) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Thompson, Hatcher and Soliday
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Slager
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 203: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Senators Ford Jon and Bohacek added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Charbonneau added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Mishler added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Melton
|
|
|