Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Public Law 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2023
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 263: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative McNamara
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 109: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Walker K) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senators Koch, Glick, Taylor G, Pol, Sandlin added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senator Freeman added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Senator Bohacek added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Walker K
|
|
|