Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 197
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 547: yeas 93, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 518: yeas 41, nays 7
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Heaton added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Representative Speedy removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Gaskill and Taylor G
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Bassler and Qaddoura
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Slager, Pierce K and Moseley
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Speedy and Miller K
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Concurrence withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Concurrence failed for lack of constitutional majority; Roll Call 459: yeas 19, nays 22
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 96, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Speedy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 94: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Senator Gaskill added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Bassler
|
|
|