Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Public Law 115
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 359: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 360: yeas 86, nays 11
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Representatives Davis M, Jeter C, Greene R added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Representatives Jeter C and Greene R removed as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Representative McNamara added as sponsor
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2023
|
Representative Davis M removed as sponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Young M added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Doriot added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Koch added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Jeter C and Greene R
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Davis
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 147: yeas 31, nays 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Pol) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senator Donato
|
|
|