Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 200
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 474: yeas 27, nays 23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 438: yeas 63, nays 36
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment #2 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 405: yeas 32, nays 62
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Teshka) prevailed; Roll Call 404: yeas 63, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Behning, King J, Jordan
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Teshka
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 157: yeas 28, nays 20
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Senator Freeman removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 135: yeas 13, nays 33
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 134: yeas 13, nays 33
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Amendment #5 (Rogers) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Senator Charbonneau removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Crane added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Ford Jon removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Senator Leising removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Authored by Senators Rogers, Raatz, Donato
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senators Buchanan, Doriot, Messmer, Gaskill, Sandlin, Brown L, Johnson, Holdman, Deery, Bassler, Ford Jon, Byrne, Charbonneau, Niemeyer, Freeman, Leising, Alexander, Buck
|
|
|