Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Public Law 255
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senator Young M added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 386: yeas 38, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 368: yeas 70, nays 19
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Hatfield) motion withdrawn
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Jeter) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Representative Torr added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Senator Bohacek added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Steuerwald and McNamara
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
House sponsor: Representative Jeter
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 34, nays 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Senator Baldwin added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Pol) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 13: yeas 11, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Senator Freeman added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Senator Bray added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Senator Koch
|
|
|