Senate | 02/26/2024 | Senator Walker K added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
House | 02/06/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 98, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/05/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Busch | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Representative Morris added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Reassigned to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Representative Johnson | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Pressel and King |