House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 41
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 38, nays 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Carrasco added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senator Zay added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senator Pol added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senator Vinzant added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senators Dernulc, Goode, Becker, Garten added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senators Charbonneau and Niemeyer added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Senator Niezgodski added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/17/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Cosponsor: Senator Busch
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 7: yeas 75, nays 19
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Walker K, Alting, Messmer
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Manning
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Jeter, Steuerwald, Soliday
|
|
|