House | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 42 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 240: yeas 89, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | Motion to concur filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Returned to the House with amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 201: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 93, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Freeman | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Authored by Representative Engleman | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representatives Pierce K, Boy and DeLaney |