*HB1027.1* January 23, 2024 HOUSE BILL No. 1027 _____ DIGEST OF HB 1027 (Updated January 23, 2024 8:57 am - DI 140) Citations Affected: IC 36-8. Synopsis: Fire department work schedule. Provides that a fire department may deviate from the required maximum work hours for members of the fire department only if authorized by a collective bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding, or other similar written mutual agreement with an exclusive recognized representative of employees of the fire department. Effective: July 1, 2024. Hostettler January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government. January 23, 2024, reported — Do Pass. HB 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 January 23, 2024 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. HOUSE BILL No. 1027 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning local government. Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: 1 SECTION 1. IC 36-8-4-9 IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS 2 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. (a) Except as provided in 3 subsection (c), a member of a regularly organized and paid fire 4 department may not be required to work more than an average of 5 fifty-six (56) hours per week. However, if on September 1, 1985, a fire 6 department was using sixty-three (63) hours as the maximum average 7 number of hours a member could work a week, the department may 8 continue to use that figure as the standard. A member may not be on 9 duty more than twenty-four (24) consecutive hours and must be off 10 duty at least twenty-four (24) consecutive hours out of any forty-eight 11 (48) hour period. Each member is entitled to an additional twenty-four 12 (24) consecutive hours off duty in every eight (8) day period. 13 (b) Notwithstanding subsection (a), in case of emergency, or if the 14 personnel of the fire department has been reduced below its regular 15 strength because members are serving in the armed forces of the United 16 States, the chief of the fire department, the assistant chief, or other 17 officer in charge may assign a member of the fire department to HB 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 2 1 continuous duty during the emergency. 2 (c) A fire department may deviate from the required maximum 3 work hours described in subsection (a) only if authorized by a 4 collective bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding, 5 or other similar written mutual agreement with an exclusive 6 recognized representative (as defined in IC 36-8-22-5) of employees 7 of the fire department. HB 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 3 COMMITTEE REPORT Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Local Government, to which was referred House Bill 1027, has had the same under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with the recommendation that said bill do pass. (Reference is to HB 1027 as introduced.) MAY Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 HB 1027—LS 6300/DI 116