| 1 | + | *EH1027.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 23, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1027 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1027 (Updated February 22, 2024 11:11 am - DI 87) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 36-8. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Fire department work schedule. Provides that a fire |
---|
| 9 | + | department may deviate from the required maximum work hours for |
---|
| 10 | + | members of the fire department only if authorized by a collective |
---|
| 11 | + | bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding, or other similar |
---|
| 12 | + | written mutual agreement with an exclusive recognized representative |
---|
| 13 | + | of employees of the fire department. |
---|
| 14 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 15 | + | Hostettler, May, Borders, |
---|
| 16 | + | Johnson B |
---|
| 17 | + | (SENATE SPONSORS — TOMES, FORD J.D.) |
---|
| 18 | + | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 23, 2024, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 20 | + | January 25, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 21 | + | January 31, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 93, nays 1. |
---|
| 22 | + | SENATE ACTION |
---|
| 23 | + | February 12, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government. |
---|
| 24 | + | February 22, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 25 | + | EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 February 23, 2024 |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 36-8-4-9 IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
15 | | - | [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. (a) Except as provided in |
---|
16 | | - | subsection (c), a member of a regularly organized and paid fire |
---|
17 | | - | department may not be required to work more than an average of |
---|
18 | | - | fifty-six (56) hours per week. However, if on September 1, 1985, a fire |
---|
19 | | - | department was using sixty-three (63) hours as the maximum average |
---|
20 | | - | number of hours a member could work a week, the department may |
---|
21 | | - | continue to use that figure as the standard. A member may not be on |
---|
22 | | - | duty more than twenty-four (24) consecutive hours and must be off |
---|
23 | | - | duty at least twenty-four (24) consecutive hours out of any forty-eight |
---|
24 | | - | (48) hour period. Each member is entitled to an additional twenty-four |
---|
25 | | - | (24) consecutive hours off duty in every eight (8) day period. |
---|
26 | | - | (b) Notwithstanding subsection (a), in case of emergency, or if the |
---|
27 | | - | personnel of the fire department has been reduced below its regular |
---|
28 | | - | strength because members are serving in the armed forces of the United |
---|
29 | | - | States, the chief of the fire department, the assistant chief, or other |
---|
30 | | - | officer in charge may assign a member of the fire department to |
---|
31 | | - | continuous duty during the emergency. |
---|
32 | | - | (c) A fire department may deviate from the required maximum |
---|
33 | | - | work hours described in subsection (a) only if authorized by a |
---|
34 | | - | collective bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding, |
---|
35 | | - | or other similar written mutual agreement with an exclusive |
---|
36 | | - | HEA 1027 2 |
---|
37 | | - | recognized representative (as defined in IC 36-8-22-5) of employees |
---|
38 | | - | of the fire department. |
---|
39 | | - | HEA 1027 Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
40 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
41 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
42 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
43 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
44 | | - | HEA 1027 |
---|
| 41 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 36-8-4-9 IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS |
---|
| 42 | + | 2 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. (a) Except as provided in |
---|
| 43 | + | 3 subsection (c), a member of a regularly organized and paid fire |
---|
| 44 | + | 4 department may not be required to work more than an average of |
---|
| 45 | + | 5 fifty-six (56) hours per week. However, if on September 1, 1985, a fire |
---|
| 46 | + | 6 department was using sixty-three (63) hours as the maximum average |
---|
| 47 | + | 7 number of hours a member could work a week, the department may |
---|
| 48 | + | 8 continue to use that figure as the standard. A member may not be on |
---|
| 49 | + | 9 duty more than twenty-four (24) consecutive hours and must be off |
---|
| 50 | + | 10 duty at least twenty-four (24) consecutive hours out of any forty-eight |
---|
| 51 | + | 11 (48) hour period. Each member is entitled to an additional twenty-four |
---|
| 52 | + | 12 (24) consecutive hours off duty in every eight (8) day period. |
---|
| 53 | + | 13 (b) Notwithstanding subsection (a), in case of emergency, or if the |
---|
| 54 | + | 14 personnel of the fire department has been reduced below its regular |
---|
| 55 | + | 15 strength because members are serving in the armed forces of the United |
---|
| 56 | + | 16 States, the chief of the fire department, the assistant chief, or other |
---|
| 57 | + | 17 officer in charge may assign a member of the fire department to |
---|
| 58 | + | EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 2 |
---|
| 59 | + | 1 continuous duty during the emergency. |
---|
| 60 | + | 2 (c) A fire department may deviate from the required maximum |
---|
| 61 | + | 3 work hours described in subsection (a) only if authorized by a |
---|
| 62 | + | 4 collective bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding, |
---|
| 63 | + | 5 or other similar written mutual agreement with an exclusive |
---|
| 64 | + | 6 recognized representative (as defined in IC 36-8-22-5) of employees |
---|
| 65 | + | 7 of the fire department. |
---|
| 66 | + | EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 3 |
---|
| 67 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 68 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Local Government, to which was |
---|
| 69 | + | referred House Bill 1027, has had the same under consideration and |
---|
| 70 | + | begs leave to report the same back to the House with the |
---|
| 71 | + | recommendation that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 72 | + | (Reference is to HB 1027 as introduced.) |
---|
| 73 | + | |
---|
| 74 | + | MAY |
---|
| 75 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0 |
---|
| 76 | + | _____ |
---|
| 77 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 78 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to |
---|
| 79 | + | which was referred House Bill No. 1027, has had the same under |
---|
| 80 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with |
---|
| 81 | + | the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. |
---|
| 82 | + | (Reference is to HB 1027 as printed January 23, 2024.) |
---|
| 83 | + | |
---|
| 84 | + | BUCK, Chairperson |
---|
| 85 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0 |
---|
| 86 | + | EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 |
---|