Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1027 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/22/2024

                    *EH1027.1*
February 23, 2024
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1027
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1027 (Updated February 22, 2024 11:11 am - DI 87)
Citations Affected:  IC 36-8.
Synopsis:  Fire department work schedule. Provides that a fire
department may deviate from the required maximum work hours for
members of the fire department only if authorized by a collective
bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding, or other similar
written mutual agreement with an exclusive recognized representative
of employees of the fire department.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Hostettler, May, Borders,
Johnson B
(SENATE SPONSORS — TOMES, FORD J.D.)
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
January 23, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
January 25, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 31, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 93, nays 1.
SENATE ACTION
February 12, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government.
February 22, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116  February 23, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1027
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning local
government.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 36-8-4-9 IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS
2 [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. (a) Except as provided in
3 subsection (c), a member of a regularly organized and paid fire
4 department may not be required to work more than an average of
5 fifty-six (56) hours per week. However, if on September 1, 1985, a fire
6 department was using sixty-three (63) hours as the maximum average
7 number of hours a member could work a week, the department may
8 continue to use that figure as the standard. A member may not be on
9 duty more than twenty-four (24) consecutive hours and must be off
10 duty at least twenty-four (24) consecutive hours out of any forty-eight
11 (48) hour period. Each member is entitled to an additional twenty-four
12 (24) consecutive hours off duty in every eight (8) day period.
13 (b) Notwithstanding subsection (a), in case of emergency, or if the
14 personnel of the fire department has been reduced below its regular
15 strength because members are serving in the armed forces of the United
16 States, the chief of the fire department, the assistant chief, or other
17 officer in charge may assign a member of the fire department to
EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 2
1 continuous duty during the emergency.
2 (c) A fire department may deviate from the required maximum
3 work hours described in subsection (a) only if authorized by a
4 collective bargaining agreement, memorandum of understanding,
5 or other similar written mutual agreement with an exclusive
6 recognized representative (as defined in IC 36-8-22-5) of employees
7 of the fire department.
EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116 3
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Local Government, to which was
referred House Bill 1027, has had the same under consideration and
begs leave to report the same back to the House with the
recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1027 as introduced.) 
 
MAY
Committee Vote: Yeas 11, Nays 0
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Local Government, to
which was referred House Bill No. 1027, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the Senate with
the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HB 1027 as printed January 23, 2024.)
           
BUCK, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0
EH 1027—LS 6300/DI 116