Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1070 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 02/15/2024

                    *EH1070.1*
February 16, 2024
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1070
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1070 (Updated February 14, 2024 10:43 am - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 12-21.
Synopsis:  Mental health grants. Allows the division of mental health
and addiction to award mental health grants to for-profit community
mental health organizations if a nonprofit organization does not qualify
for the grant. 
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Cash, Lauer, Pack
(SENATE SPONSOR — CRIDER)
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health.
January 9, 2024, reassigned to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs.
January 25, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass.
January 29, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed.
January 30, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 90, nays 4.
SENATE ACTION
February 7, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider
Services.
February 15, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass.
EH 1070—LS 6160/DI 147  February 16, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
ENGROSSED
HOUSE BILL No. 1070
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
human services.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 12-21-5-9 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. Except as required by federal law, the division may
4 award a grant that is administered by the division for mental
5 health care and services to a for-profit community mental health
6 organization if a nonprofit organization does not qualify for the
7 grant. 
EH 1070—LS 6160/DI 147 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Family, Children and Human
Affairs, to which was referred House Bill 1070, has had the same under
consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with
the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows:
Page 1, line 3, after "may" insert "award a grant that is
administered by the division for mental health care and services to
a for-profit community mental health organization if a nonprofit
organization does not qualify for the grant.".
Page 1, delete lines 4 through 9.
and when so amended that said bill do pass.
(Reference is to HB 1070 as introduced.)
DEVON
Committee Vote: yeas 9, nays 1.
_____
COMMITTEE REPORT
Madam President: The Senate Committee on Health and Provider
Services, to which was referred House Bill No. 1070, has had the same
under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the
Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS.
 (Reference is to HB 1070 as printed January 25, 2024.)
           
CHARBONNEAU, Chairperson
Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0
EH 1070—LS 6160/DI 147