| 1 | + | *EH1070.1* |
---|
| 2 | + | February 16, 2024 |
---|
| 3 | + | ENGROSSED |
---|
| 4 | + | HOUSE BILL No. 1070 |
---|
| 5 | + | _____ |
---|
| 6 | + | DIGEST OF HB 1070 (Updated February 14, 2024 10:43 am - DI 140) |
---|
| 7 | + | Citations Affected: IC 12-21. |
---|
| 8 | + | Synopsis: Mental health grants. Allows the division of mental health |
---|
| 9 | + | and addiction to award mental health grants to for-profit community |
---|
| 10 | + | mental health organizations if a nonprofit organization does not qualify |
---|
| 11 | + | for the grant. |
---|
| 12 | + | Effective: July 1, 2024. |
---|
| 13 | + | Cash, Lauer, Pack |
---|
| 14 | + | (SENATE SPONSOR — CRIDER) |
---|
| 15 | + | January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health. |
---|
| 16 | + | January 9, 2024, reassigned to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs. |
---|
| 17 | + | January 25, 2024, amended, reported — Do Pass. |
---|
| 18 | + | January 29, 2024, read second time, ordered engrossed. Engrossed. |
---|
| 19 | + | January 30, 2024, read third time, passed. Yeas 90, nays 4. |
---|
| 20 | + | SENATE ACTION |
---|
| 21 | + | February 7, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Provider |
---|
| 22 | + | Services. |
---|
| 23 | + | February 15, 2024, reported favorably — Do Pass. |
---|
| 24 | + | EH 1070—LS 6160/DI 147 February 16, 2024 |
---|
1 | 25 | | Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024) |
---|
2 | 26 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
3 | 27 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
4 | 28 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
5 | 29 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
6 | 30 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
7 | 31 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
8 | 32 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
9 | 33 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
10 | 34 | | between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
14 | | - | SECTION 1. IC 12-21-5-9 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
15 | | - | AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
16 | | - | 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. Except as required by federal law, the division may |
---|
17 | | - | award a grant that is administered by the division for mental |
---|
18 | | - | health care and services to a for-profit community mental health |
---|
19 | | - | organization if a nonprofit organization does not qualify for the |
---|
20 | | - | grant. |
---|
21 | | - | HEA 1070 Speaker of the House of Representatives |
---|
22 | | - | President of the Senate |
---|
23 | | - | President Pro Tempore |
---|
24 | | - | Governor of the State of Indiana |
---|
25 | | - | Date: Time: |
---|
26 | | - | HEA 1070 |
---|
| 40 | + | 1 SECTION 1. IC 12-21-5-9 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE |
---|
| 41 | + | 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY |
---|
| 42 | + | 3 1, 2024]: Sec. 9. Except as required by federal law, the division may |
---|
| 43 | + | 4 award a grant that is administered by the division for mental |
---|
| 44 | + | 5 health care and services to a for-profit community mental health |
---|
| 45 | + | 6 organization if a nonprofit organization does not qualify for the |
---|
| 46 | + | 7 grant. |
---|
| 47 | + | EH 1070—LS 6160/DI 147 2 |
---|
| 48 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 49 | + | Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Family, Children and Human |
---|
| 50 | + | Affairs, to which was referred House Bill 1070, has had the same under |
---|
| 51 | + | consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the House with |
---|
| 52 | + | the recommendation that said bill be amended as follows: |
---|
| 53 | + | Page 1, line 3, after "may" insert "award a grant that is |
---|
| 54 | + | administered by the division for mental health care and services to |
---|
| 55 | + | a for-profit community mental health organization if a nonprofit |
---|
| 56 | + | organization does not qualify for the grant.". |
---|
| 57 | + | Page 1, delete lines 4 through 9. |
---|
| 58 | + | and when so amended that said bill do pass. |
---|
| 59 | + | (Reference is to HB 1070 as introduced.) |
---|
| 60 | + | DEVON |
---|
| 61 | + | Committee Vote: yeas 9, nays 1. |
---|
| 62 | + | _____ |
---|
| 63 | + | COMMITTEE REPORT |
---|
| 64 | + | Madam President: The Senate Committee on Health and Provider |
---|
| 65 | + | Services, to which was referred House Bill No. 1070, has had the same |
---|
| 66 | + | under consideration and begs leave to report the same back to the |
---|
| 67 | + | Senate with the recommendation that said bill DO PASS. |
---|
| 68 | + | (Reference is to HB 1070 as printed January 25, 2024.) |
---|
| 69 | + | |
---|
| 70 | + | CHARBONNEAU, Chairperson |
---|
| 71 | + | Committee Vote: Yeas 10, Nays 0 |
---|
| 72 | + | EH 1070—LS 6160/DI 147 |
---|