Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1075 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1075
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 2-5-54.3; IC 20-30.
Synopsis:  Curriculum reform. Establishes the high school curriculum
reform committee. Requires each school corporation, charter school,
and state accredited nonpublic elementary school to include cursive
writing in its curriculum.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Bartlett
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education.
2024	IN 1075—LS 6414/DI 148 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1075
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
education.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 2-5-54.3 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 54.3. High School Curriculum Reform Committee
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "committee" refers to the
6 committee established under section 2 of this chapter.
7 Sec. 2. The high school curriculum reform committee is
8 established. The committee shall study high school curriculum
9 reform. The committee serves the general assembly.
10 Sec. 3. The committee operates under the policies governing
11 study committees adopted by the legislative council. The legislative
12 services agency staffs the committee.
13 Sec. 4. The speaker shall appoint a member of the house to serve
14 as chairperson of the committee. The chairperson serves a two (2)
15 year term and serves at the pleasure of the chairperson's
16 appointing authority.
17 Sec. 5. (a) The committee consists of the following nine (9)
2024	IN 1075—LS 6414/DI 148 2
1 members:
2 (1) Four (4) members of the senate, not more than two (2) of
3 whom may be affiliated with the same political party,
4 appointed by the president pro tem.
5 (2) Four (4) members of the house, not more than two (2) of
6 whom may be affiliated with the same political party,
7 appointed by the speaker.
8 (3) One (1) member of the house appointed under section 4 of
9 this chapter.
10 (b) The initial appointments to the committee must be made not
11 later than July 1, 2024.
12 (c) A member of the committee serves for a term of two (2)
13 years. A member's term ends on June 30.
14 (d) If a legislative member of the committee ceases being a
15 member of the body from which the member was appointed, the
16 member's position on the committee is vacant. In addition, a
17 committee member may be removed at any time by the member's
18 appointing authority. A vacancy on the committee must be filled by
19 the original appointing authority not more than thirty (30) days
20 after the vacancy begins.
21 (e) Each member of the committee is entitled to receive per
22 diem, mileage, and travel allowances. Per diem, mileage, and travel
23 allowances paid under this chapter shall be paid from
24 appropriations to the legislative council or the legislative services
25 agency.
26 Sec. 6. (a) Subject to subsection (b), the chairperson shall call
27 three (3) committee meetings per calendar year.
28 (b) The following requirements apply to the three (3) required
29 committee meetings:
30 (1) One (1) meeting must be held in each of the following
31 regions of the state:
32 (A) Northern.
33 (B) Central.
34 (C) Southern.
35 (2) One (1) meeting must take place in each of the following
36 months:
37 (A) March.
38 (B) July.
39 (C) November.
40 (3) A committee meeting must not take place in the same
41 physical location more than once.
42 (4) The following individuals must be invited to each meeting:
2024	IN 1075—LS 6414/DI 148 3
1 (A) Administrators from each school district.
2 (B) Teachers from each school.
3 Sec. 7. Committee meetings are open to the public under
4 IC 5-14-1.5. However, the chairperson may restrict testimony to
5 administrators and teachers.
6 Sec. 8. The committee shall submit a final report in an electronic
7 format under IC 5-14-6 to the legislative council when requested by
8 the legislative council.
9 Sec. 9. The affirmative votes of a majority of the members
10 appointed to the committee are required for the committee to take
11 action on any measure, including final reports.
12 Sec. 10. This chapter expires December 31, 2034.
13 SECTION 2. IC 20-30-5-7, AS AMENDED BY P.L.32-2021,
14 SECTION 56, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
15 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 7. (a) Each school corporation shall include in the
16 school corporation's curriculum the following studies:
17 (1) Language arts, including:
18 (A) English;
19 (B) grammar;
20 (C) composition;
21 (D) speech; and
22 (E) second languages; and
23 (F) for an elementary school, cursive writing.
24 (2) Mathematics.
25 (3) Social studies and citizenship, including the:
26 (A) constitutions;
27 (B) governmental systems; and
28 (C) histories;
29 of Indiana and the United States, including an enhanced study of
30 the Holocaust in each high school United States history course.
31 As part of the United States government credit awarded for the
32 general, Core 40, Core 40 with academic honors, and Core 40
33 with technical honors designation, each high school shall
34 administer the naturalization examination provided by the United
35 States Citizenship and Immigration Services.
36 (4) Sciences, including, after June 30, 2021, computer science.
37 (5) Fine arts, including music and art.
38 (6) Health education, physical fitness, safety, and the effects of
39 alcohol, tobacco, drugs, and other substances on the human body.
40 (7) Additional studies selected by each governing body, subject
41 to revision by the state board.
42 (b) Each:
2024	IN 1075—LS 6414/DI 148 4
1 (1) school corporation;
2 (2) charter school; and
3 (3) state accredited nonpublic school;
4 shall offer the study of ethnic and racial groups as a one (1) semester
5 elective course in its high school curriculum at least once every school
6 year.
7 (c) The course described in subsection (b) may be offered by the
8 school corporation, charter school, or state accredited nonpublic school
9 through a course access program administered by the department.
10 (d) Not later than November 1, 2022, and not later than November
11 1 each year thereafter, the department shall report to the general
12 assembly in an electronic format under IC 5-14-6 the following:
13 (1) The number of students who took the naturalization
14 examination described in subsection (a)(3).
15 (2) The number of students who passed the naturalization
16 examination described in subsection (a)(3) by a score of not less
17 than sixty percent (60%) on their first attempt.
18 (3) The pass rate of the naturalization examination regarding the
19 students who passed as described in subdivision (2).
20 (e) Not more than thirty (30) days after the department reports to the
21 general assembly the information under subsection (d), the department
22 shall post the pass rate under subsection (d)(3) on the department's
23 Internet web site. website.
24 SECTION 3. IC 20-30-5-7.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
25 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
26 1, 2024]: Sec. 7.2. A charter school and a state accredited nonpublic
27 elementary school shall include in the charter school's and state
28 accredited nonpublic elementary school's curriculum language arts
29 studies in cursive writing.
30 SECTION 4. IC 20-30-6.1-2 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE JULY
31 1, 2024]. Sec. 2. Each school corporation may include cursive writing
32 in the school corporation's curriculum.
2024	IN 1075—LS 6414/DI 148