House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 132
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 302: yeas 39, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 305: yeas 66, nays 26
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Representative Manning added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Representative Andrade removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Representative Manning removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Johnson T added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Qaddoura removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Johnson T removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Randolph Lonnie M and Johnson T
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Baldwin and Qaddoura
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Manning, Haggard and Moseley
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Teshka and Andrade
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Zay added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senators Koch and Raatz added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 41, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senators Messmer, Freeman, Gaskill added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Baldwin) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Baldwin) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Senator Johnson T added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 73, nays 22
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Baldwin
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Smith V) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Smith V) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representative Speedy added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Teshka
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Manning and Haggard
|
|
|