House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 133
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 297: yeas 62, nays 31
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 276: yeas 39, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Hunley) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Hunley) failed; Roll Call 248: yeas 10, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senator Rogers added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Buchanan
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 59: yeas 66, nays 31
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Lehman added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative King J added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Garcia Wilburn) failed; Roll Call 47: yeas 28, nays 67
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Garcia Wilburn) failed; Roll Call 46: yeas 26, nays 68
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Amendment #4 (Culp) prevailed; Roll Call 45: yeas 67, nays 27
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representative VanNatter added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Culp
|
|
|