House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 51
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 188: yeas 88, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 46, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senators Walker G and Taylor G added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Koch, Brown L, Donato
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Representative Bauer M added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Representatives McGuire and Davis added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Lauer
|
|
|