House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 134
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 313: yeas 34, nays 13
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 321: yeas 82, nays 12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senator Donato added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Senator Taylor G removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Snow, Payne and Jackson
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Heine and Summers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Ford J.D. and Johnson T
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Walker G and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 178: yeas 10, nays 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 177: yeas 9, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Senators Donato and Becker added as cosponsors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Walker G and Johnson T
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 75, nays 21
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Summers) failed; Roll Call 52: yeas 30, nays 65
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Heine) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative DeVon added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative Heaton removed as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Heine
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Snow, Barrett, Heaton
|
|
|