House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 136
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 334: yeas 42, nays 5
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 355: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Senator Mishler added as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Niezgodski and Baldwin
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Qaddoura
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Judy, Clere, Cherry, Snow and Porter
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Thompson and Pryor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 251: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 73, nays 21
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Holdman
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; Roll Call 53: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Representative Cherry added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representative Clere added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Thompson
|
|
|