Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1129 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/04/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6268	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 5, 2023
BILL NUMBER: HB 1129	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Transportation Projects.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Manning	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: State
XDEDICATED
XFEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill defines "J-turn intersection". The bill adds a provision allowing the
General Assembly to pass a bill that disapproves funding for one or more projects on the Indiana Department
of Transportation's (INDOT) project priority list. 
The bill also prohibits money in the State Highway Fund from being used for the study, design, development,
survey, construction, reconstruction, operation, or maintenance of a J-turn intersection that is not completed
before June 30, 2024.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: Summary - The bill would reduce State Highway Fund expenditures
on J-Turn intersection projects that are set to be completed or planned after June 30, 2024. INDOT reports
approximately $96 M in federal and State Highway Funds are expected to be used on projects that would be
impacted by the bill. Depending on the decision of INDOT administrators, these unused funds could instead
be used on other infrastructure improvement projects in the state. 
Additional Information - INDOT constructed the first J-Turn intersection (reduced conflict intersection) in
June 2016. By mid-year 2019, six more J-Turn intersections had been built. The cost to retrofit an existing
intersection was reported to be between a few hundred thousand dollars to more than $1 M, depending on
conditions. 
INDOT reports there are 32 projects that could be impacted by the bill, with the average project costs for
each estimated at $3 M. Project costs would be a blend of state and federal funds, with the state contributing
HB 1129	1 a minimum of approximately 20%, depending on the specific project. 
It is assumed the state could reallocate these costs to other infrastructure projects in the state. However to
the extent substitute projects do not meet federal requirements and the state cannot reallocate $76.8 M in
federal funds within the period of availability, the state would lose these federal obligations. 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: INDOT. 
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: Federal Highway Association Allocation of Highway Infrastructure Programs Project
memorandum March 21, 2023; Andrea Zimmerman, INDOT;
https://www.in.gov/indot/traffic-operations/median-u-turns/;
Fiscal Analyst: Bill Brumbach,  317-232-9559.
HB 1129	2