Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1129 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1129
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 8-23.
Synopsis:  Transportation projects. Defines "J-turn intersection". Adds
a provision allowing the general assembly to pass a bill that
disapproves funding for one or more projects on the Indiana
department of transportation's project priority list. Prohibits money in
the state highway fund from being used for the study, design,
development, survey, construction, reconstruction, operation, or
maintenance of a J-turn intersection that is not completed before June
30, 2024.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Manning
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation.
2024	IN 1129—LS 6268/DI 137 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1129
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
transportation.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 8-23-1-25.5 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]: Sec. 25.5. "J-turn intersection" (also known as a "median
4 U-turn intersection", "reduced conflict intersection", and
5 "Michigan left") means a traffic flow that requires a driver to turn
6 right in the same direction of traffic and merge into the left lane to
7 make a U-turn to head in the direction the driver intends to travel.
8 SECTION 2. IC 8-23-2-19, AS ADDED BY P.L.218-2017,
9 SECTION 79, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
10 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 19. (a) The department shall:
11 (1) establish a single statewide set of state and local road and
12 bridge condition metrics;
13 (2) use the metrics in subdivision (1) to:
14 (A) evaluate and compare state and local road and bridge
15 conditions in local units within Indiana; and
16 (B) evaluate and compare Indiana's statewide road and bridge
17 conditions to road and bridge conditions in states with similar
2024	IN 1129—LS 6268/DI 137 2
1 climate, soil, and traffic conditions; and
2 (3) develop goals, timelines, and milestones to ensure that
3 Indiana's state and local road and bridge conditions are in the top
4 quarter of the states included in the comparison in subdivision (2).
5 (b) The department shall develop a state and local road and bridge
6 project prioritization system and project priority list. The project
7 prioritization system must be based on a model that includes at least the
8 following variables:
9 (1) Safety.
10 (2) Congestion.
11 (3) Environment.
12 (4) Regional and state economic contribution.
13 (5) Potential intermodal connectivity.
14 (6) Total cost of ownership.
15 (c) The commissioner shall appoint two (2) economic professionals
16 and two (2) engineering professionals to establish and administer the
17 project prioritization system and model. The appointees:
18 (1) serve at the pleasure of the commissioner; and
19 (2) are entitled to compensation set by the budget agency.
20 (d) The department shall use the results of the model established
21 under this section to determine short term and long term budgetary
22 needs. The determination must achieve the following infrastructure
23 goals:
24 (1) Preserve and maintain current infrastructure resources.
25 (2) Provide for projected mobility needs for movement of people
26 and goods.
27 (e) The department may adjust the project priority list established
28 under this section if the department determines that unforeseen
29 circumstances require an adjustment.
30 (f) The general assembly may not approve or disapprove projects on
31 the department's project priority list. The general assembly may pass
32 a bill that disapproves funding for one (1) or more projects on the
33 department's project priority list. If the general assembly passes a
34 bill that disapproves funding for a project, the department must:
35 (1) immediately remove the project from the department's
36 project priority list; and
37 (2) not later than thirty (30) days after the date the bill is
38 passed, consult with the legislators who represent the district
39 or districts in which the project is located;
40 before a new project may be established for the same location.
41 SECTION 3. IC 8-23-9-55 IS AMENDED TO READ AS
42 FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 55. (a) Money in the
2024	IN 1129—LS 6268/DI 137 3
1 state highway fund shall be used for the following:
2 (1) Operation of the department.
3 (2) Construction, reconstruction, operation, maintenance, and
4 control of the state highways that are the responsibility of the
5 department and of tollways that are the responsibility of the
6 department under IC 8-15-3.
7 (b) Beginning July 1, 2024, money in the state highway fund
8 may not be used for the study, design, development, survey,
9 construction, reconstruction, operation, or maintenance of a J-turn
10 intersection. This subsection does not apply to a J-turn intersection
11 for which construction is completed before June 30, 2024.
2024	IN 1129—LS 6268/DI 137