House
|
03/11/2024
|
Public Law 56
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Senator Buck added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 134: yeas 83, nays 14
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Koch, Freeman, Baldwin
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representatives Bartels, Jeter C, Torr added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Lucas
|
|
|