Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1144 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1144
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 6-3.1-41.
Synopsis:  Income tax credit for firearms safety expenses. Provides a
state income tax credit for expenses incurred to receive qualified
firearms instruction or to purchase a qualified firearms storage device.
Provides that the tax credit is equal to the amount of the incurred
expenses. Provides that the maximum amount allowed as a tax credit
is $300 for individuals filing single returns or $600 for married couples
filing joint returns. Provides that a tax credit may not exceed the
taxpayer's state income tax liability. Provides that a taxpayer is not
entitled to a carryover, carryback, or refund of any unused tax credit.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Lucas
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
2024	IN 1144—LS 6375/DI 134 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1144
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
taxation.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 6-3.1-41 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 41. Income Tax Credit for Firearms Safety Expenses
5 Sec. 1. This chapter applies to taxable years beginning after
6 December 31, 2024.
7 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "firearms safety expenses" refers
8 to the following:
9 (1) Tuition or any other fee paid by a taxpayer to receive
10 qualified firearms instruction.
11 (2) The purchase price of a qualified firearms storage device.
12 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "qualified firearms instruction"
13 means a firearms safety course taught by an instructor certified to
14 teach firearms safety by the National Rifle Association.
15 Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "qualified firearms storage
16 device" refers to the following:
17 (1) A safe, lockbox, cabinet, or other container designed to
2024	IN 1144—LS 6375/DI 134 2
1 store firearms securely by restricting access to the firearms
2 by a locking device.
3 (2) A locking device that, when installed on a firearm, is
4 designed to prevent the firearm from being operated without
5 first deactivating the device.
6 Sec. 5. As used in this chapter, "state income tax liability"
7 means a taxpayer's adjusted gross income tax liability under
8 IC 6-3.
9 Sec. 6. As used in this chapter, "taxpayer" means:
10 (1) an individual filing a single return; or
11 (2) a married couple filing a joint return.
12 Sec. 7. (a) Subject to subsections (b) and (c), a taxpayer is
13 entitled to a credit against the taxpayer's state income tax liability
14 in a taxable year equal to the total amount of firearms safety
15 expenses incurred by the taxpayer in that taxable year.
16 (b) The maximum amount allowed as a credit under this section
17 is:
18 (1) three hundred dollars ($300), in the case of an individual
19 filing a single return; or
20 (2) six hundred dollars ($600), in the case of a married couple
21 filing a joint return.
22 (c) A credit awarded under this chapter may not exceed the
23 taxpayer's state income tax liability.
24 Sec. 8. To obtain a credit under this chapter, a taxpayer must
25 claim the credit in the manner prescribed by the department. The
26 taxpayer shall submit to the department proof of the taxpayer's
27 firearms safety expenses and all information that the department
28 determines is necessary for the calculation of the credit provided
29 by this chapter.
30 Sec. 9. A taxpayer is not entitled to any carryover, carryback,
31 or refund of any unused credit.
2024	IN 1144—LS 6375/DI 134