Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1149 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1149
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1-12-14.
77 Synopsis: Assessed value deduction for disabled veterans. Increases
88 the assessed value cap, from $200,000 to $240,000, that applies to the
99 property tax deduction for a veteran who: (1) has a total disability; or
1010 (2) is at least 62 years of age and has at least a 10% disability. Provides
1111 that for purposes of determining the assessed value of the real property,
1212 mobile home, or manufactured home for an individual who has
1313 received a deduction in a previous year, increases in assessed value that
1414 occur after December 31, 2024, are not considered for purposes of
1515 determining whether an individual is eligible to receive the deduction.
1616 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1717 Cherry
1818 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
1919 2024 IN 1149—LS 6479/DI 116 Introduced
2020 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2121 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2222 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2323 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2424 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2525 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2626 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2727 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2828 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2929 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3030 HOUSE BILL No. 1149
3131 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3232 taxation.
3333 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3434 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-12-14, AS AMENDED BY P.L.174-2022,
3535 2 SECTION 20, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3636 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 14. (a) Except as provided in subsection (c) and
3737 4 except as provided in section 40.5 of this chapter, an individual may
3838 5 have the sum of fourteen thousand dollars ($14,000) deducted from the
3939 6 assessed value of the real property, mobile home not assessed as real
4040 7 property, or manufactured home not assessed as real property that the
4141 8 individual owns (or the real property, mobile home not assessed as real
4242 9 property, or manufactured home not assessed as real property that the
4343 10 individual is buying under a contract that provides that the individual
4444 11 is to pay property taxes on the real property, mobile home, or
4545 12 manufactured home if the contract or a memorandum of the contract is
4646 13 recorded in the county recorder's office) if:
4747 14 (1) the individual served in the military or naval forces of the
4848 15 United States for at least ninety (90) days;
4949 16 (2) the individual received an honorable discharge;
5050 17 (3) the individual either:
5151 2024 IN 1149—LS 6479/DI 116 2
5252 1 (A) has a total disability; or
5353 2 (B) is at least sixty-two (62) years old and has a disability of at
5454 3 least ten percent (10%);
5555 4 (4) the individual's disability is evidenced by:
5656 5 (A) a pension certificate or an award of compensation issued
5757 6 by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs; or
5858 7 (B) a certificate of eligibility issued to the individual by the
5959 8 Indiana department of veterans' affairs after the Indiana
6060 9 department of veterans' affairs has determined that the
6161 10 individual's disability qualifies the individual to receive a
6262 11 deduction under this section; and
6363 12 (5) the individual:
6464 13 (A) owns the real property, mobile home, or manufactured
6565 14 home; or
6666 15 (B) is buying the real property, mobile home, or manufactured
6767 16 home under contract;
6868 17 on the date the statement required by section 15 of this chapter is
6969 18 filed.
7070 19 (b) Except as provided in subsections (c) and (d), the surviving
7171 20 spouse of an individual may receive the deduction provided by this
7272 21 section if:
7373 22 (1) the individual satisfied the requirements of subsection (a)(1)
7474 23 through (a)(4) at the time of death; or
7575 24 (2) the individual:
7676 25 (A) was killed in action;
7777 26 (B) died while serving on active duty in the military or naval
7878 27 forces of the United States; or
7979 28 (C) died while performing inactive duty training in the military
8080 29 or naval forces of the United States; and
8181 30 the surviving spouse satisfies the requirement of subsection (a)(5) at
8282 31 the time the deduction statement is filed. The surviving spouse is
8383 32 entitled to the deduction regardless of whether the property for which
8484 33 the deduction is claimed was owned by the deceased veteran or the
8585 34 surviving spouse before the deceased veteran's death.
8686 35 (c) Except as provided in subsection (f), subsection (f) or (g), no
8787 36 one is entitled to the deduction provided by this section if the assessed
8888 37 value of the individual's Indiana real property, Indiana mobile home not
8989 38 assessed as real property, and Indiana manufactured home not assessed
9090 39 as real property, as shown by the tax duplicate, exceeds the assessed
9191 40 value limit specified in subsection (d).
9292 41 (d) Except as provided in subsection (f), subsection (f) or (g), for
9393 42 the:
9494 2024 IN 1149—LS 6479/DI 116 3
9595 1 (1) January 1, 2017, January 1, 2018, and January 1, 2019,
9696 2 assessment dates, the assessed value limit for purposes of
9797 3 subsection (c) is one hundred seventy-five thousand dollars
9898 4 ($175,000); and
9999 5 (2) January 1, 2020, January 1, 2021, January 1, 2022, January
100100 6 1, 2023, and January 1, 2024, assessment dates, assessment
101101 7 date and for each assessment date thereafter, the assessed value
102102 8 limit for purposes of subsection (c) is two hundred thousand
103103 9 dollars ($200,000); and
104104 10 (3) January 1, 2025, assessment date and for each assessment
105105 11 date thereafter, the assessed value limit for purposes of
106106 12 subsection (c) is two hundred forty thousand dollars
107107 13 ($240,000).
108108 14 (e) An individual who has sold real property, a mobile home not
109109 15 assessed as real property, or a manufactured home not assessed as real
110110 16 property to another person under a contract that provides that the
111111 17 contract buyer is to pay the property taxes on the real property, mobile
112112 18 home, or manufactured home may not claim the deduction provided
113113 19 under this section against that real property, mobile home, or
114114 20 manufactured home.
115115 21 (f) This subsection applies to assessment dates before January
116116 22 1, 2025. For purposes of determining the assessed value of the real
117117 23 property, mobile home, or manufactured home under subsection (d) for
118118 24 an individual who has received a deduction under this section in a
119119 25 previous year, increases in assessed value that occur after the later of:
120120 26 (1) December 31, 2019; or
121121 27 (2) the first year that the individual has received the deduction;
122122 28 are not considered unless the increase in assessed value is attributable
123123 29 to substantial renovation or new improvements. Where there is an
124124 30 increase in assessed value for purposes of the deduction under this
125125 31 section, the assessor shall provide a report to the county auditor
126126 32 describing the substantial renovation or new improvements, if any, that
127127 33 were made to the property prior to the increase in assessed value.
128128 34 (g) This subsection applies for assessment dates after December
129129 35 31, 2024. For purposes of determining the assessed value of the real
130130 36 property, mobile home, or manufactured home under subsection
131131 37 (d) for an individual who has received a deduction under this
132132 38 section in a previous year, increases in assessed value that occur
133133 39 after December 31, 2024, are not considered for purposes of
134134 40 determining whether an individual is eligible to receive the
135135 41 deduction under this section.
136136 42 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024] (a) IC 6-1.1-12-14, as
137137 2024 IN 1149—LS 6479/DI 116 4
138138 1 amended by this act, applies to assessment dates after December
139139 2 31, 2024.
140140 3 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2028.
141141 2024 IN 1149—LS 6479/DI 116