Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1152 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1152
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1-12-14.
77 Synopsis: Assessed value deductions for disabled veterans. Eliminates
88 the assessed value cap that applies to the property tax deduction for a
99 veteran who: (1) has a total disability; or (2) is at least 62 years of age
1010 and has at least a 10% disability.
1111 Effective: July 1, 2024.
1212 Lauer, Aylesworth
1313 January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
1414 2024 IN 1152—LS 6762/DI 116 Introduced
1515 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
1616 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
1717 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
1818 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
1919 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2020 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2121 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2222 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2323 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2424 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2525 HOUSE BILL No. 1152
2626 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
2727 taxation.
2828 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
2929 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-12-14, AS AMENDED BY P.L.174-2022,
3030 2 SECTION 20, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3131 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 14. (a) Except as provided in subsection (c) and
3232 4 except as provided in section 40.5 of this chapter, an individual may
3333 5 have the sum of fourteen thousand dollars ($14,000) deducted from the
3434 6 assessed value of the real property, mobile home not assessed as real
3535 7 property, or manufactured home not assessed as real property that the
3636 8 individual owns (or the real property, mobile home not assessed as real
3737 9 property, or manufactured home not assessed as real property that the
3838 10 individual is buying under a contract that provides that the individual
3939 11 is to pay property taxes on the real property, mobile home, or
4040 12 manufactured home if the contract or a memorandum of the contract is
4141 13 recorded in the county recorder's office) if:
4242 14 (1) the individual served in the military or naval forces of the
4343 15 United States for at least ninety (90) days;
4444 16 (2) the individual received an honorable discharge;
4545 17 (3) the individual either:
4646 2024 IN 1152—LS 6762/DI 116 2
4747 1 (A) has a total disability; or
4848 2 (B) is at least sixty-two (62) years old and has a disability of at
4949 3 least ten percent (10%);
5050 4 (4) the individual's disability is evidenced by:
5151 5 (A) a pension certificate or an award of compensation issued
5252 6 by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs; or
5353 7 (B) a certificate of eligibility issued to the individual by the
5454 8 Indiana department of veterans' affairs after the Indiana
5555 9 department of veterans' affairs has determined that the
5656 10 individual's disability qualifies the individual to receive a
5757 11 deduction under this section; and
5858 12 (5) the individual:
5959 13 (A) owns the real property, mobile home, or manufactured
6060 14 home; or
6161 15 (B) is buying the real property, mobile home, or manufactured
6262 16 home under contract;
6363 17 on the date the statement required by section 15 of this chapter is
6464 18 filed.
6565 19 (b) Except as provided in subsections (c) and (d), The surviving
6666 20 spouse of an individual may receive the deduction provided by this
6767 21 section if:
6868 22 (1) the individual satisfied the requirements of subsection (a)(1)
6969 23 through (a)(4) at the time of death; or
7070 24 (2) the individual:
7171 25 (A) was killed in action;
7272 26 (B) died while serving on active duty in the military or naval
7373 27 forces of the United States; or
7474 28 (C) died while performing inactive duty training in the military
7575 29 or naval forces of the United States; and
7676 30 the surviving spouse satisfies the requirement of subsection (a)(5) at
7777 31 the time the deduction statement is filed. The surviving spouse is
7878 32 entitled to the deduction regardless of whether the property for which
7979 33 the deduction is claimed was owned by the deceased veteran or the
8080 34 surviving spouse before the deceased veteran's death.
8181 35 (c) Except as provided in subsection (f), no one is entitled to the
8282 36 deduction provided by this section if the assessed value of the
8383 37 individual's Indiana real property, Indiana mobile home not assessed as
8484 38 real property, and Indiana manufactured home not assessed as real
8585 39 property, as shown by the tax duplicate, exceeds the assessed value
8686 40 limit specified in subsection (d).
8787 41 (d) Except as provided in subsection (f), for the:
8888 42 (1) January 1, 2017, January 1, 2018, and January 1, 2019,
8989 2024 IN 1152—LS 6762/DI 116 3
9090 1 assessment dates, the assessed value limit for purposes of
9191 2 subsection (c) is one hundred seventy-five thousand dollars
9292 3 ($175,000); and
9393 4 (2) January 1, 2020, assessment date and for each assessment date
9494 5 thereafter, the assessed value limit for purposes of subsection (c)
9595 6 is two hundred thousand dollars ($200,000).
9696 7 (e) (c) An individual who has sold real property, a mobile home not
9797 8 assessed as real property, or a manufactured home not assessed as real
9898 9 property to another person under a contract that provides that the
9999 10 contract buyer is to pay the property taxes on the real property, mobile
100100 11 home, or manufactured home may not claim the deduction provided
101101 12 under this section against that real property, mobile home, or
102102 13 manufactured home.
103103 14 (f) For purposes of determining the assessed value of the real
104104 15 property, mobile home, or manufactured home under subsection (d) for
105105 16 an individual who has received a deduction under this section in a
106106 17 previous year, increases in assessed value that occur after the later of:
107107 18 (1) December 31, 2019; or
108108 19 (2) the first year that the individual has received the deduction;
109109 20 are not considered unless the increase in assessed value is attributable
110110 21 to substantial renovation or new improvements. Where there is an
111111 22 increase in assessed value for purposes of the deduction under this
112112 23 section, the assessor shall provide a report to the county auditor
113113 24 describing the substantial renovation or new improvements, if any, that
114114 25 were made to the property prior to the increase in assessed value.
115115 26 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2024] (a) IC 6-1.1-12-14, as
116116 27 amended by this act, applies to assessment dates after December
117117 28 31, 2024.
118118 29 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2028.
119119 2024 IN 1152—LS 6762/DI 116