House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 139
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 278: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 219: yeas 47, nays 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 20: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman and Garten
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Representatives May, Steuerwald, Johnson, Zimmerman added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Rule 105.1 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Zimmerman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Meltzer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Lehman
|
|
|