House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 141
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 346: yeas 69, nays 29
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 328: yeas 26, nays 21
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Messmer added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Vinzant removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Senator Messmer removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Representative Soliday added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2024
|
Representative Harris removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate advisors appointed: Taylor G and Messmer
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Vinzant
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Bartels and Gore
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House conferees appointed: Pressel and Harris
|
|
|
House
|
02/29/2024
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 135: yeas 88, nays 9
|
|
|
House
|
02/05/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2024
|
Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 114: yeas 30, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Representative Bartels added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
01/08/2024
|
Authored by Representative Pressel
|
|
|