Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1166 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/04/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6510	NOTE PREPARED: Dec 19, 2023
BILL NUMBER: HB 1166	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Chronic Weight Management Task Force.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Shackleford	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED: GENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill establishes the Chronic Weight Management Task Force to study and
make recommendations concerning chronic weight related diseases and Type 2 diabetes.
Effective Date:  July 1, 2024.
Explanation of State Expenditures: The newly established Chronic Weight Management Task Force (task
force) is comprised of 13 members, including:
•eight legislators (two legislators will serve as co-chairs of the task force);
•two lay members;
•the Indiana Department of Health Commissioner;
•the Department of Insurance Commissioner; and
•the Family and Social Services Administration Secretary.
The task force is expected to cost between $4,000 and $10,000 depending on the number of meetings held
before it sunsets on December 31, 2024. The task force will meet at the call of the co-chairs and must hold
their first meeting before August 1, 2024. The estimated cost per task force meeting is between $2,000 and
$2,500, depending on the distance members must travel to attend a meeting. It is expected that the task force
will hold between two and four total meetings.
The task force must submit a report to the Legislative Council by November 15, 2024. The Legislative
Services Agency (LSA) must staff the task force.
The bill’s requirements are within the routine administrative functions of agencies with task force
HB 1166	1 membership and the LSA and should be able to be implemented with no additional appropriations, assuming
near customary agency staffing and resource levels.
Additional Information: Task force members who are state employees will receive travel reimbursement.
Members who are not state employees will receive per diem, mileage, and travel reimbursement. As of
January 2024, legislator per diem is $196, lay member per diem is $75, and mileage reimbursement is $0.67
per mile.
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: Legislative Services Agency; Indiana Department of Health; Department of
Insurance; Family and Social Services Administration.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: Jason Barrett,  317-232-9809.
HB 1166	2