Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1166 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1166
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 2-5-54.
Synopsis:  Chronic weight management task force. Establishes the
chronic weight management task force to study and make
recommendations concerning chronic weight related diseases and Type
2 diabetes.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Shackleford
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Public Health.
2024	IN 1166—LS 6510/DI 147 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1166
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning the
general assembly.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 2-5-54 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3 1, 2024]:
4 Chapter 54. Chronic Weight Management Task Force
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "task force" refers to the chronic
6 weight management task force established by section 2 of this
7 chapter.
8 Sec. 2. The chronic weight management task force is established.
9 Sec. 3. (a) The task force consist of the following thirteen (13)
10 members:
11 (1) Four (4) members of the senate, appointed as follows:
12 (A) Two (2) members appointed by the president pro
13 tempore, one (1) of whom shall serve as co-chair of the task
14 force.
15 (B) Two (2) members appointed by the minority leader of
16 the senate.
17 (2) Four (4) members of the house of representatives,
2024	IN 1166—LS 6510/DI 147 2
1 appointed as follows:
2 (A) Two (2) members appointed by the speaker, one (1) of
3 whom shall serve as co-chair of the task force.
4 (B) Two (2) members appointed by the minority leader of
5 the house.
6 (3) The commissioner of the Indiana department of health or
7 the commissioner's designee.
8 (4) The commissioner of the department of insurance or the
9 commissioner's designee.
10 (5) The secretary of the office of the secretary of family and
11 social services or the secretary's designee.
12 (6) One (1) member who represents the Wellness Council of
13 Indiana, appointed by the speaker of the house of
14 representatives.
15 (7) One (1) member who is a physician licensed under
16 IC 25-22.5 and certified in obesity medicine by the American
17 Board of Obesity Medicine, appointed by the president pro
18 tempore of the senate.
19 (b) A member of the task force serves for the duration of the
20 task force.
21 (c) If a vacancy occurs on the task force, the appointing
22 authority that appointed the member position that is vacant shall
23 appoint an individual to fill the vacancy.
24 (d) An individual appointed to fill a vacancy serves for the
25 remainder of the term of the member the individual is appointed
26 to succeed.
27 Sec. 4. (a) Seven (7) members of the task force constitute a
28 quorum.
29 (b) The affirmative vote of at least a majority of the members
30 appointed to the task force are required for the task force to take
31 action, including a final report.
32 (c) The task force shall meet at the call of the co-chairs.
33 However, the task force shall hold its first meeting before August
34 1, 2024.
35 Sec. 5. All meetings of the task force are open to the public in
36 accordance with and subject to IC 5-14-1.5. All records of the task
37 force are subject to the requirements of IC 5-14-3.
38 Sec. 6. The task force shall study the following issues:
39 (1) The health implications of weight related chronic diseases
40 and Type 2 diabetes.
41 (2) The costs associated with managing weight related chronic
42 diseases and Type 2 diabetes.
2024	IN 1166—LS 6510/DI 147 3
1 (3) The treatments available to reduce weight related chronic
2 diseases and Type 2 diabetes in Indiana.
3 (4) How to promote the use of data concerning the diseases
4 described in subdivision (3) to influence decision making to
5 understand the cost savings of preventing weight related
6 chronic diseases and Type 2 diabetes.
7 Sec. 7. Not later than November 15, 2024, the task force shall
8 prepare and submit a report to the legislative council in an
9 electronic format under IC 5-14-6 summarizing the task force's
10 findings and recommendations concerning the issues described in
11 section 6 of this chapter.
12 Sec. 8. The legislative services agency shall staff the task force.
13 Sec. 9. (a) Each legislative member and each lay member of the
14 task force is entitled to receive the same per diem, mileage, and
15 travel allowances paid to individuals serving as legislative and lay
16 members, respectively, on an interim study committee established
17 by the legislative council.
18 (b) A member of the task force who is a state employee is not
19 entitled to a per diem. However, the member is entitled to receive
20 the same travel allowances paid to members of the task force
21 described in subsection (a).
22 Sec. 10. This chapter expires December 31, 2024.
2024	IN 1166—LS 6510/DI 147