Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1170 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/04/2024

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1170
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 21-14-4.
Synopsis:  Tuition and educational cost exemptions. Repeals a
provision concerning certain disability ratings, as determined by the
United States Department of Veterans Affairs, and educational cost
exemptions.
Effective:  July 1, 2024.
Hamilton
January 8, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Education.
2024	IN 1170—LS 6527/DI 143 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1170
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
higher education.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 21-14-4-2, AS AMENDED BY P.L.112-2019,
2 SECTION 9, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 2. (a) Subject to this section and section 2.5 of this
4 chapter, subsection (b), an eligible applicant is entitled to enter,
5 remain, and receive instruction in a state educational institution upon
6 the same conditions, qualifications, and regulations prescribed for other
7 applicants for admission to or scholars in the state educational
8 institutions, without the payment of any educational costs for one
9 hundred twenty-four (124) semester credit hours in the state
10 educational institution.
11 (b) The maximum amount that an eligible applicant is exempt from
12 paying for a semester hour is an amount equal to the cost of an
13 undergraduate semester credit hour at the state educational institution
14 in which the eligible applicant enrolls.
15 (c) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter or another
16 law, a change in the criteria for or the amount of an exemption awarded
17 under this chapter enacted in the 2011 session of the general assembly
2024	IN 1170—LS 6527/DI 143 2
1 applies only to an individual who qualifies for an exemption under this
2 chapter because of a father or mother (or in the case of section 1(a)(1)
3 of this chapter, a related member) who enlisted or otherwise initially
4 served in the armed forces of the United States after June 30, 2011.
5 SECTION 2. IC 21-14-4-2.5 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE JULY
6 1, 2024]. Sec. 2.5. (a) This section applies to an individual who
7 qualifies as an eligible applicant under section 1(a)(3) of this chapter
8 because the individual's father or mother:
9 (1) enlisted or otherwise initially served in the armed forces of the
10 United States after June 30, 2011; and
11 (2) suffered a disability as determined by the United States
12 Department of Veterans Affairs.
13 (b) This section does not apply to an individual who:
14 (1) is an eligible applicant under section 1(a)(3) of this chapter;
15 and
16 (2) qualifies as an eligible applicant under section 1(a)(1) or
17 1(a)(2) of this chapter.
18 (c) Subject to subsection (d) and section 2(b) of this chapter, the
19 eligible applicant is entitled to a reduction in the educational costs that
20 would otherwise apply as follows:
21 (1) If the individual's father or mother suffered a disability as
22 determined by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
23 with a rating of eighty percent (80%) or more, the individual is
24 entitled to a one hundred percent (100%) reduction in education
25 costs.
26 (2) If the individual's father or mother suffered a disability as
27 determined by the United States Department of Veterans Affairs
28 with a rating of less than eighty percent (80%), the individual is
29 entitled to a reduction in education costs equal to the sum of:
30 (A) twenty percent (20%); plus
31 (B) the disability rating of the individual's father or mother.
32 (d) The latest disability rating determined by the United States
33 Department of Veterans Affairs for an individual's father or mother
34 shall be used to compute the percentage by which education costs are
35 reduced under this section. If the disability rating of the individual's
36 father or mother changes after the beginning of an academic semester,
37 quarter, or other period for which educational costs have been reduced
38 under this section, the change in disability rating shall be applied
39 beginning with the immediately following academic semester, quarter,
40 or other period.
2024	IN 1170—LS 6527/DI 143