Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1195 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/08/2024

                    LEGISLATIVE SERVICES AGENCY
OFFICE OF FISCAL AND MANAGEMENT ANALYSIS
200 W. Washington St., Suite 301
Indianapolis, IN 46204
(317) 233-0696
iga.in.gov
FISCAL IMPACT STATEMENT
LS 6576	NOTE PREPARED: Jan 4, 2024
BILL NUMBER: HB 1195	BILL AMENDED: 
SUBJECT: Right to Counsel Eviction Task Force.
FIRST AUTHOR: Rep. Shackleford	BILL STATUS: As Introduced
FIRST SPONSOR: 
FUNDS AFFECTED:XGENERAL	IMPACT: State
DEDICATED
FEDERAL
Summary of Legislation: This bill establishes the Access to Counsel in Eviction Task Force (task force)
to review matters related to the eviction process and potential funding sources to increase a tenant's access
to counsel in an eviction proceeding. It sets forth membership, and requires the task force to issue a report
to the Legislative Council not later than November 15, 2024. The bill also provides that the task force expires
December 31, 2024.
Effective Date:  Upon passage.
Explanation of State Expenditures: This bill establishes a 12-member task force consisting of 4 legislators,
7 lay members, and a judge who resides over eviction cases in Indiana. The committee is to operate under
the policies governing study committees adopted by the Legislative Council. Legislative Council resolutions
in the past have established budgets for interim study committees in the amount of $13,500 per interim for
committees with fewer than 16 members. 
Legislative members and members of the task force who are not state employees will be paid the same per
diem, mileage, and travel allowances provided to individuals who serve on interim study committees
established by Legislative Council. Members who are state employees will be reimbursed as provided by the
policies and procedures established by the Indiana Department of Administration and approved by the State
Budget Agency.
The task force must hold at least one meeting in CY 2024, with the first meeting occurring not later than
August 1, 2024. On or before November 15, 2024, a report containing the task force’s findings and
recommendations must be submitted to the Executive Director of the Legislative Services Agency, for
HB 1195	1 distribution to the Legislative Council. 
The Legislative Services Agency will provide staff support to the Task Force, which will result in an increase
in the administrative workload for the agency. The bill’s requirements are within the agency’s routine
administrative functions and should be able to be implemented with no additional appropriations, assuming
near customary agency staffing and resource levels. 
Explanation of State Revenues: 
Explanation of Local Expenditures: 
Explanation of Local Revenues: 
State Agencies Affected: General Assembly.
Local Agencies Affected: 
Information Sources: 
Fiscal Analyst: James Johnson, 317-232-9869.
HB 1195	2