Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1195 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1195
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 2-5-54.
77 Synopsis: Right to counsel eviction task force. Establishes the access
88 to counsel in eviction task force (task force) to review matters related
99 to the eviction process and potential funding sources to increase a
1010 tenant's access to counsel in an eviction proceeding. Sets forth
1111 membership, and requires the task force to issue a report to the
1212 legislative council not later than November 15, 2024. Provides that the
1313 task force expires December 31, 2024.
1414 Effective: Upon passage.
1515 Shackleford
1616 January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory
1717 Reform.
1818 2024 IN 1195—LS 6576/DI 149 Introduced
1919 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2020 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2121 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2222 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2323 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2424 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2525 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2626 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2727 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2828 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2929 HOUSE BILL No. 1195
3030 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning the
3131 general assembly.
3232 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3333 1 SECTION 1. IC 2-5-54 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE AS
3434 2 A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE UPON
3535 3 PASSAGE]:
3636 4 Chapter 54. Access to Counsel in Eviction Task Force
3737 5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "task force" refers to the access
3838 6 to counsel in eviction task force established by section 2 of this
3939 7 chapter.
4040 8 Sec. 2. The access to counsel in eviction task force is established
4141 9 as a temporary task force serving the general assembly.
4242 10 Sec. 3. (a) The task force consists of the following twelve (12)
4343 11 members, all of whom are voting members:
4444 12 (1) A member of the house appointed by the speaker.
4545 13 (2) A member of the house appointed by the minority leader
4646 14 of the house.
4747 15 (3) A member of the senate appointed by the president pro
4848 16 tempore of the senate.
4949 17 (4) A member of the senate appointed by the minority leader
5050 2024 IN 1195—LS 6576/DI 149 2
5151 1 of the senate.
5252 2 (5) A member representing the Indiana Public Defender
5353 3 Council, appointed by the governor.
5454 4 (6) A member representing the Indiana State Bar Association,
5555 5 appointed by the governor.
5656 6 (7) A member representing the Fair Housing Center of
5757 7 Central Indiana, appointed by the governor.
5858 8 (8) A member representing the Indiana Apartment
5959 9 Association, appointed by the governor.
6060 10 (9) A member representing a tenant advocacy group,
6161 11 appointed by the speaker.
6262 12 (10) A member who is a judge who presides over eviction
6363 13 cases in Indiana, appointed by the president pro tempore of
6464 14 the senate.
6565 15 (11) Two (2) members whose income does not exceed fifty
6666 16 percent (50%) of the state median income adjusted for
6767 17 household size, appointed as follows:
6868 18 (A) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
6969 19 the house.
7070 20 (B) One (1) member appointed by the minority leader of
7171 21 the senate.
7272 22 (b) The members appointed under subsection (a)(1) and (a)(3)
7373 23 shall serve as co-chairs of the task force for the duration of the task
7474 24 force.
7575 25 (c) A member of the task force serves for the duration of the
7676 26 task force. However, a member of the task force, including each
7777 27 co-chair of the task force, serves at the will of the member's
7878 28 appointing authority.
7979 29 (d) Appointing authorities shall appoint the members of the task
8080 30 force not later than June 1, 2024.
8181 31 Sec. 4. (a) The task force shall meet at the call of the co-chairs.
8282 32 (b) The task force shall meet for the first time not later than
8383 33 August 1, 2024.
8484 34 (c) Seven (7) members of the task force constitute a quorum.
8585 35 (d) The affirmative votes of a majority of the members of the
8686 36 task force are required for the task force to take action on any
8787 37 measure, including adoption of the report under section 7(2) of this
8888 38 chapter.
8989 39 (e) All meetings of the task force are open to the public in
9090 40 accordance with and subject to IC 5-14-1.5. All records of the task
9191 41 force are subject to the requirements of IC 5-14-3.
9292 42 Sec. 5. (a) A lay or legislative member of the task force is
9393 2024 IN 1195—LS 6576/DI 149 3
9494 1 entitled to receive the same per diem, mileage, and travel
9595 2 allowances paid to legislative members of interim study committees
9696 3 established by the legislative council.
9797 4 (b) A member of the task force who is:
9898 5 (1) a state employee; and
9999 6 (2) not a member of the general assembly;
100100 7 is not entitled to a per diem. However, the member is entitled to
101101 8 reimbursement for traveling expenses as provided under
102102 9 IC 4-13-1-4 and other expenses actually incurred in connection
103103 10 with the member's duties as provided in the state policies and
104104 11 procedures established by the Indiana department of
105105 12 administration and approved by the budget agency.
106106 13 Sec. 6. The legislative services agency shall staff the task force.
107107 14 The task force shall operate under the policies and rules of the
108108 15 legislative council.
109109 16 Sec. 7. The task force shall do the following:
110110 17 (1) Conduct a study of:
111111 18 (A) the eviction process throughout Indiana and the
112112 19 performance of designated organizations and community
113113 20 groups that provide eviction relief services; and
114114 21 (B) potential funding sources to increase access to counsel
115115 22 to represent a tenant subject to an eviction proceeding.
116116 23 (2) Not later than November 15, 2024, adopt and submit to the
117117 24 executive director of the legislative services agency, for
118118 25 distribution to the legislative council, a report that includes
119119 26 the following:
120120 27 (A) The results of the task force's study under subdivision
121121 28 (1).
122122 29 (B) The task force's recommendations with regard to state
123123 30 policies, including any recommended legislation, to provide
124124 31 a tenant with increased access to counsel in an eviction
125125 32 proceeding.
126126 33 The report must be submitted in an electronic format under
127127 34 IC 5-14-6.
128128 35 Sec. 8. This chapter expires December 31, 2024.
129129 36 SECTION 2. An emergency is declared for this act.
130130 2024 IN 1195—LS 6576/DI 149