Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2024
Fiscal Note February 27, 2024
Fiscal Note February 26, 2024
Fiscal Note February 16, 2024
Fiscal Note January 30, 2024
Fiscal Note January 25, 2024
Fiscal Note January 23, 2024
Bill January 8, 2024
Fiscal Note January 8, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 15, 2024
Bill January 23, 2024