House
|
03/15/2024
|
Public Law 169
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 316: yeas 89, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Representative Thompson removed as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Representative Thompson added as author
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Representative McGuire removed as author
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
Representative Speedy removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Senator Freeman removed as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 42, nays 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Baldwin) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Committee report: Pursuant to Senate Rule 66(b); approved by Rules Committee as amended by Senate Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 86: yeas 65, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Cosponsor: Senator Messmer
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Baldwin, Garten, Freeman
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #5 (Porter) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #3 (Porter) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/29/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 54: yeas 31, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/16/2024
|
Representative Manning added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative McGuire
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Thompson and Speedy
|
|
|