Indiana 2024 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1199 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 01/25/2024

                    *HB1199.1*
January 25, 2024
HOUSE BILL No. 1199
_____
DIGEST OF HB 1199 (Updated January 24, 2024 4:03 pm - DI 140)
Citations Affected:  IC 36-7; noncode.
Synopsis:  Repeal of economic enhancement district law. Repeals the
chapter in the Indiana Code authorizing the legislative body of a first
class city to establish a special assessment district known as an
economic enhancement district.
Effective:  Upon passage.
McGuire, Thompson, Speedy,
Manning
January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
January 25, 2024, reported — Do Pass.
HB 1199—LS 6293/DI 125  January 25, 2024
Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1199
A BILL FOR AN ACT to repeal a provision of the Indiana Code
concerning local government.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 36-7-40 IS REPEALED [EFFECTIVE UPON
2 PASSAGE]. (Economic Enhancement Districts).
3 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) An economic
4 enhancement district established before the effective date of the
5 repeal of IC 36-7-40 by this act is abolished on the effective date of
6 this act.
7 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2025.
8 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
HB 1199—LS 6293/DI 125 2
COMMITTEE REPORT
Mr. Speaker: Your Committee on Ways and Means, to which was
referred House Bill 1199, has had the same under consideration and
begs leave to report the same back to the House with the
recommendation that said bill do pass. 
(Reference is to HB 1199 as introduced.) 
THOMPSON
Committee Vote: Yeas 15, Nays 9         
HB 1199—LS 6293/DI 125