House
|
03/13/2024
|
Public Law 146
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 289: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 256: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Senator Pol added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 97, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Meltzer
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Zimmerman, Moed, Smaltz
|
|
|