House | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 60 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Senator Leising added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 170: yeas 49, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities | ||
House | 01/24/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 94, nays 1 | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Senate sponsor: Senator Koch | ||
House | 01/22/2024 | Representative Zimmerman added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/18/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Representative Meltzer |