Indiana 2024 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1208 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1208
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1-8-19.5.
77 Synopsis: Assessment of wind power devices. Requires a new owner
88 of a wind power device (device) to report, when filing the owner's
99 statement of value and description of property with the department of
1010 local government finance (department) in years after the first year of
1111 ownership, the valuation of the device at the same valuation amount
1212 entered in the public utility company's first annual report after the
1313 transfer of ownership, less adjustments for depreciation according to a
1414 schedule prescribed by the department. Urges the legislative council to
1515 assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying
1616 utility scale wind and solar power taxation.
1717 Effective: Upon passage; July 1, 2024.
1818 Negele
1919 January 9, 2024, read first time and referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and
2020 Telecommunications.
2121 2024 IN 1208—LS 6935/DI 125 Introduced
2222 Second Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2024)
2323 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2424 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2525 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2626 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2727 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2828 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2929 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3030 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3131 between statutes enacted by the 2023 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3232 HOUSE BILL No. 1208
3333 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3434 taxation.
3535 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3636 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-8-19.5, AS ADDED BY P.L.144-2023,
3737 2 SECTION 1, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3838 3 JULY 1, 2024]: Sec. 19.5. (a) This section applies to a public utility
3939 4 company that:
4040 5 (1) owns or operates one (1) or more wind power devices; and
4141 6 (2) is filing the public utility company's first annual report as the
4242 7 new owner of the wind power devices following a change in
4343 8 ownership.
4444 9 (b) This section does not apply to a public utility company that owns
4545 10 or operates one (1) or more wind power devices and that has signed or
4646 11 countersigned an economic development agreement, or another
4747 12 financial agreement, that is entered into:
4848 13 (1) with the county in which the public utility company's wind
4949 14 power devices are located; and
5050 15 (2) for the purpose of:
5151 16 (A) repowering the wind power devices; or
5252 17 (B) upgrading the technology used in the wind power devices;
5353 2024 IN 1208—LS 6935/DI 125 2
5454 1 before a sale or transfer of the wind power devices.
5555 2 (c) As used in this section, "annual report" means the statement of
5656 3 value and description of property described in section 19 of this
5757 4 chapter.
5858 5 (d) As used in this section, "change of ownership", with respect to
5959 6 one (1) or more wind power devices owned by a public utility
6060 7 company, means any:
6161 8 (1) transaction or series of related transactions (whether as a
6262 9 result of a tender offer, merger, consolidation, reorganization,
6363 10 acquisition, sale or transfer of equity securities, proxy, power of
6464 11 attorney, or otherwise) that results in, or occurs in connection
6565 12 with, another public utility company acquiring beneficial
6666 13 ownership, directly or indirectly, of a majority of the then issued
6767 14 and outstanding voting securities or combined voting rights of the
6868 15 public utility company; or
6969 16 (2) sale, lease, exchange, conveyance, transfer, distribution, or
7070 17 other disposition whether:
7171 18 (A) for cash, securities, equity interests, or other consideration;
7272 19 or
7373 20 (B) made in connection with any liquidation, dissolution, or
7474 21 winding up of the affairs of the public utility company;
7575 22 of substantially all of the public utility company's wind power
7676 23 devices to another public utility company.
7777 24 (e) As used in this section, "wind power device" means a device,
7878 25 including a windmill or a wind turbine, that is designed to use the
7979 26 kinetic energy of moving air to provide mechanical energy or to
8080 27 produce electricity.
8181 28 (f) Notwithstanding any other law or rule adopted by the
8282 29 department, a public utility company described in subsection (a) shall:
8383 30 (1) value the wind power devices at the same valuation amount
8484 31 that the previous owner valued the devices prior to the change in
8585 32 ownership on the previous owner's last annual report;
8686 33 (2) enter that valuation amount on the public utility company's
8787 34 first annual report following the change in ownership; and
8888 35 (3) notify the department in a timely manner of the change in
8989 36 ownership;
9090 37 if the valuation amount that the public utility company would otherwise
9191 38 enter on the report, in accordance with this chapter and the rules
9292 39 prescribed by the department, is lower than the valuation amount that
9393 40 the previous owner valued the wind power devices before the change
9494 41 in ownership on the previous owner's last annual report.
9595 42 (g) For years subsequent to the first year after the change in
9696 2024 IN 1208—LS 6935/DI 125 3
9797 1 ownership, the public utility company shall calculate value and report
9898 2 the valuation of the wind power devices on the annual report in
9999 3 accordance with this chapter and the rules prescribed by the
100100 4 department. However, in determining the just value of the property of
101101 5 the public utility company in any year subsequent to the first year after
102102 6 the change in ownership, the department shall not consider valuations
103103 7 determined by another governmental agency, notwithstanding section
104104 8 26(b)(5) of this chapter. at the same valuation amount entered on
105105 9 the public utility company's first annual report under subsection
106106 10 (f)(2), less adjustments for depreciation made according to a
107107 11 schedule prescribed by the department.
108108 12 (h) The department shall:
109109 13 (1) make changes to the annual report form necessary to conform
110110 14 with the provisions of this section; and
111111 15 (2) create a depreciation schedule for purposes of determining
112112 16 valuation amounts under subsection (g).
113113 17 (i) The Indiana utility regulatory commission shall include a
114114 18 provision in an order issued under IC 8-1-2.5-5 to a public utility
115115 19 company that:
116116 20 (1) owns or operates one (1) or more wind power devices; or
117117 21 (2) plans to own or operate one (1) or more wind power devices;
118118 22 requiring the public utility company to notify the department of any
119119 23 change in ownership of the wind power devices.
120120 24 (j) Before November 1, 2024, and before November 1, 2025, the
121121 25 department shall prepare, submit in an electronic format under
122122 26 IC 5-14-6, and present to the interim study committee on energy,
123123 27 utilities, and telecommunications established by IC 2-5-1.3-4(8) a
124124 28 report on the valuation of wind power devices and the progress of
125125 29 implementing this section.
126126 30 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE UPON PASSAGE] (a) The legislative
127127 31 council is urged to assign to the appropriate interim study
128128 32 committee established under IC 2-5 during the 2024 legislative
129129 33 interim the task of studying utility scale wind and solar power
130130 34 taxation.
131131 35 (b) This SECTION expires December 31, 2024.
132132 36 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
133133 2024 IN 1208—LS 6935/DI 125