House | 03/11/2024 | Public Law 61 | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 211: yeas 31, nays 17 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2024 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 85, nays 8 | ||
House | 02/01/2024 | Senate sponsors: Senators Brown L and Johnson T | ||
House | 01/30/2024 | Representative Prescott added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/29/2024 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/16/2024 | Representative Steuerwald added as coauthor | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Authored by Representative Heine | ||
House | 01/09/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Snow |