House
|
03/15/2024
|
Public Law 170
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2024
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2024
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 281: yeas 65, nays 26
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Senator Buck added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 33, nays 15
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #2 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 182: yeas 17, nays 32
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 181: yeas 18, nays 31
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senator Bohacek added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Senator Doriot added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Senator Tomes added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 37: yeas 68, nays 27
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Freeman
|
|
|
House
|
01/22/2024
|
Amendment #1 (Errington) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Representative Torr added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2024
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Authored by Representative Jeter
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2024
|
Coauthored by Representatives Manning and Davis
|
|
|